VA HB80 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Teacher licensure by reciprocity; third-party verification of application documents. Requires the Board of Education, in its regulations providing for teacher licensure by reciprocity, to permit applicants to submit third-party employment verification forms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher licensure by reciprocity; third-party verification of application documents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
2018-04-04 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 747 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-06 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-06HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
2018-03-03SenateSigned by President
2018-02-28HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-28HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB80ER)
2018-02-28HouseEnrolled
2018-02-26SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26SenateRead third time
2018-02-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-22SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-06HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05HousePrinted as engrossed 18100860D-E
2018-02-05HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB80E
2018-02-05HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-05HouseRead second time
2018-02-02HouseRead first time
2018-01-31HouseReported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-12-07HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2017-12-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100860D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221298.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB80
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB80+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB80E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB80ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0747+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0901V0020+HB0080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H09V0026+HB0080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0349+HB0080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0266+HB0080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0676HB0080+HB0080
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0689HB0080+HB0080

Bill Comments

feedback