VA HB8 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Disorderly conduct in public places; school activities. Eliminates the Class 1 misdemeanor for disrupting willfully or while intoxicated, whether willfully or not, the operation of any school or any school activity conducted or sponsored by any school if the disruption (i) prevents or interferes with the orderly conduct of the operation or activity or (ii) has a direct tendency to cause acts of violence by the person or persons at whom, individually, the disruption is directed.
Title
Disorderly conduct in public places; school activities.
Sponsors
Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Alex Askew [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Incorporated by Courts of Justice |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB256-Mullin) by voice vote |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2019-11-18 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-11-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100560D |
Same As/Similar To
HB256 (Similar To) 2020-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0199)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB8 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB8+hil |