VA HB799 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Child day programs; potable water; lead testing. Requires licensed child day programs and certain other programs that serve preschool-age children to develop and implement a plan to test potable water from sources identified by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency as high priority. The bill requires such plan and the results of each such test to be submitted to and reviewed by the Commissioner of Social Services and the Department of Health's Office of Drinking Water. The bill stipulates that if the result of any such test indicates a level of lead in the potable water that is at or above 15 parts per billion, the program shall remediate the level of lead in the potable water to below 15 parts per billion, confirm such remediation by retesting the water, and submit the results of the retests to the Commissioner of Social Services and the Department of Health's Office of Drinking Water for review. The bill also provides such programs the option of using bottled water in lieu of testing or remediation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child day programs; lead testing, potable water, effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB799ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-08SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-03-07HouseVOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N)
2020-03-07HouseConference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
2020-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-04SenateSenators: McPike, Lewis, Cosgrove
2020-03-04SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-03HouseDelegates: Askew, Lopez, Rush
2020-03-03HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-03HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-03-02SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-03-02SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N)
2020-02-27HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 100-N)
2020-02-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-25SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-02-25SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-25SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-25SenateRead third time
2020-02-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20SenateRereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-02-20SenateRereferred from Education and Health (10-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2020-01-28HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-28HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Social Services
2020-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-15HouseReferred from Education by voice vote
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101841D

Same As/Similar To

SB393 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321705.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB799&201+sum+HB799
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB799+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB799ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1204V0011+HB0799
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0052+HB0799
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0205V0002+HB0799
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0205V0038+HB0799
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0116+HB0799
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0169+HB0799
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0753+HB0799
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0246+HB0799
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S09V0134+HB0799
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0930HB0799+HB0799
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0963HB0799+HB0799
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1559+HB0799
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1321HB0799+HB0799
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2035+HB0799
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1858HB0799+HB0799

Bill Comments

feedback