VA HB794 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB794

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Flood Insurance Fund; low-income Virginians. Creates a Flood Insurance Fund and directs the Executive Director of the Board of Directors of the Virginia Resources Authority to establish a program to use the Fund to subsidize the purchase of flood insurance by low-income Virginians. Such program shall include an application process, application guidelines, and a ranking system that prioritizes the use of the Fund to support the purchase of flood insurance in the most flood-prone areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Flood Insurance Fund; established, low-income Virginians.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Appropriations
2020-02-05HouseContinued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote
2020-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-01-29HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2020-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-29HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (18-Y 4-N)
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102530D

Same As/Similar To

HB794 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101603.28(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback