VA HB794 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Indoor Clean Air Act; smoking in public buildings prohibited; penalty. Prohibits smoking in any building owned or leased by the Commonwealth or any agency thereof or any locality. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Indoor Clean Air Act; smoking in public buildings prohibited, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in General Laws
2018-02-01HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N)
2018-01-24HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104473D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522820(n/a)See Bill Text
1522823(n/a)See Bill Text
1522824(n/a)See Bill Text
1522826(n/a)See Bill Text
1522829(n/a)See Bill Text
1522830(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback