VA HB794 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Nonsolicitation agreements. Establishes five requirements for a valid and enforceable nonsolicitation agreement between an employer and an employee, including a requirement that the restrictions imposed by the agreement are protective of the employer's legitimate business interest. The requirements do not apply to nonsolicitation agreements between an employer and an employee who owned greater than five percent of the ownership interests of the employing business entity. Absent an agreement to the contrary, the solicitation activities that are restrained, prohibited, or otherwise restricted by a nonsolicitation agreement shall not be increased or expanded as a result of the employer being acquired by merging with another business entity. The measure requires courts in actions seeking enforcement of, or challenging the enforceability of, a nonsolicitation agreement to award attorney fees and costs to the prevailing party. The measure does not apply in proceedings to determine the enforceability of agreements entered into prior to July 1, 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment; nonsolicitation agreements between employers and employees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-12HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2014-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2014-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2014-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2014-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103250D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40128.7:5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback