VA HB794 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Urban development areas. Makes incorporation of urban development areas optional rather than mandatory. Any locality that has previously adopted urban development areas may, and upon voter petition shall, reconsider such action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urban development areas; incorporation of areas optional rather than mandatory, etc.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-14 House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
2012-02-02 House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2012-01-17 House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2
2012-01-11 House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2012-01-11 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102627D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522223.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback