VA HB788 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0150)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0150)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requirements that paid tax return preparers use identification numbers; civil penalty. Directs the Department of Taxation (the Department) to require paid tax return preparers to provide their federal Preparer Tax Identification Number (PTIN) when preparing or assisting in preparing tax returns. The bill authorizes the Department to bar or suspend tax return preparers for repeated failure to provide their PTIN and imposes a civil penalty of $50 for each failure to provide a PTIN, not to exceed $25,000 per year. The bill requires the Department to promulgate regulations for using the PTIN as an oversight mechanism to identify patterns of fraud. In addition, the bill directs the Department to establish information-sharing protocols with the Internal Revenue Service and authorizes the Department to establish similar protocols with other states.
Title
Tax return preparers; requirement that paid preparers use identification numbers, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0150) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 150 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2018-03-05 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB788ER2) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB788ER) |
2018-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102441D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 348.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 348.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 348.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |