VA HB787 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Continued to 2019 in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Continued to 2019 in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Real property taxes; appeals to boards of equalization. Provides that on appeal of a real property assessment to a board of equalization, the taxpayer shall not be required to show that the assessment is a result of manifest error or disregard of controlling evidence.
Title
Real property taxes; appeals to boards of equalization.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 18101856D-E |
2018-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB787E |
2018-02-01 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101856D |