VA HB780 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Returns of service; acceptance of copies of proofs of service. Provides that a photocopy, facsimile, or other copy of the original proof of service shall be accepted by the clerk's office as if it were an original proof of service for the purposes of complying with the return of service process to the clerk's office, provided that the proponent provides a statement that any such copy is a true copy of the original.
Title
Returns of service; acceptance of copies of proofs of service.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (10-Y 3-N 2-A) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (10-Y 3-N 2-A) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 158 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 4, 2020 | |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB780ER) |
2020-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-19 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (31-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendment (10-Y 3-N 2-A) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 20100889D-E |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB780E |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (19-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100889D |