VA HB780 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public access to nonconfidential court records. Provides that a clerk of court or the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court shall make nonconfidential court records or reports of aggregated, nonconfidential case data available to the public upon request. The bill specifies that such records or reports shall be provided no later than 30 days after the request. The bill further provides that the clerk may charge a fee for responding to such request that shall not exceed the actual cost incurred in accessing, duplicating, reviewing, supplying, or searching for the requested records. Finally, the bill requires the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court to make available to the public an online case information system of nonconfidential information for criminal cases by July 1, 2019. This bill is identical to SB 564.
Title
Nonconfidential court records; clerk of court shall make records available to public upon request.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 127 (effective - see bill) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB780ER) |
2018-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-09 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Printed as engrossed 18106425D-EH1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB780EH1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Amendments by Delegate Habeeb agreed to |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106425D-H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106425D-H1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104557D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 69.54:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 292 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 293 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 293.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |