VA HB78 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; waiver of first-time licensing fees for low-income applicants. Requires any regulatory board within the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation to waive the initial application fee for any low-income individual applying for any license, certificate, or registration issued by the regulatory board or the Department. The bill defines "low-income individual" as any individual whose gross annual income is less than $25,000 per year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional and Occupational Regulation, Department of; waiver of first-time licensing fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Appropriations
2018-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-30HouseCommittee substitute printed 18106038D-H1
2018-01-30HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-12-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-12-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100913D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
541201(n/a)See Bill Text
541201.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback