VA HB779 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Transportation by voice vote
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Fuels Tax Act; refueling vehicles. Exempts persons properly licensed by the Department of Motor Vehicles from the prohibition on delivering fuel from a transport truck or tank wagon to the fuel tank of a highway vehicle, provided that such vehicle is on certain premises or a site approved by the local fire official. The bill requires the Department to license such delivery persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Fuels Tax Act; refueling vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06HouseContinued to 2021 in Transportation by voice vote
2020-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-02-04HouseReconsidered by Transportation Innovations and General Topics Subcommittee
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N)
2020-01-23HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics
2020-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-01-22HouseReferred from Finance by voice vote
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105102D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5812204(n/a)See Bill Text
5812272(n/a)See Bill Text
591162.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback