VA HB777 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Emergency air medical transportation; informed decision. Requires emergency medical services personnel, prior to initiating contact with an emergency air medical transportation provider for air transport of a patient, to obtain written consent from the patient after disclosing certain information. The bill provides that emergency medical services personnel shall be exempt from such requirements if compliance might jeopardize the health or safety of the patient or the patient is unable to provide consent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency air medical transportation; informed decision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30HouseLeft in Health, Welfare and Institutions
2018-02-06HouseContinued to 2019 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2018-01-29HouseRereferred to Health, Welfare and Institutions
2018-01-29HouseMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2018-01-26HousePassed by for the day
2018-01-25HouseRead first time
2018-01-23HouseCommittee substitute printed 18105504D-H1
2018-01-23HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (14-Y 7-N)
2018-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102247D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321111.4:9(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback