VA HB774 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - VOTE: Engrossment (41-Y 51-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - VOTE: Engrossment (41-Y 51-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth Transportation Board; revenue-sharing funds. Increases the maximum matching allocation that the Commonwealth Transportation Board may make to a locality from $5 million to $10 million and increases the portion of such funds that such locality may use for the maintenance of highway systems from $2.5 million to $5 million.
Title
Commonwealth Transportation Board; increases revenue-sharing funds.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Engrossment (41-Y 51-N) (Y: 41 N: 51 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Engrossment (41-Y 51-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossment refused by House (41-Y 51-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred from Finance by voice vote |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103803D |