VA HB773 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Nuisance; breach of peace. Provides that the attorney for the Commonwealth or the attorney for the locality may maintain a civil action in the circuit court for the jurisdiction in which a nuisance is alleged to exist to abate the nuisance, enjoin the maintenance of the nuisance, and enjoin the use of any building or property adjudged to be a nuisance. "Nuisance" is defined in the bill as any real property, building, place, or ground, including the furniture, fixtures, and contents thereof, where repeated acts constituting breaches of the peace are conducted or permitted to occur. "Breach of the peace" is defined as an act that disturbs the public order, including homicide, assault, affray, communication of a threat, unlawful possession of a dangerous or deadly weapon, and unlawful discharge of a firearm.
Title
Nuisance; breach of peace.
Sponsors
Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104359D |