VA HB765 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Transportation processes in the Commonwealth; responsibilities of transportation entities; funding. Expands the responsibilities of the Office of Intermodal Planning and Investment of the Secretary of Transportation (Office). The bill clarifies the residency requirements for the urban and rural at-large members of the Commonwealth Transportation Board (Board) and provides that no member of a governing body of a locality is eligible to be appointed to the Board during his term of office. The bill provides that the Board's Six-Year Improvement Program shall only commit funds from the State of Good Repair Program, the High Priority Projects Program, or the Highway Construction District Grant Programs to a project or program if such commitment is sufficient to complete the project or program. The bill changes the timing of reports from annually to biennially, expands the requirements of the biennial report provided by the Commissioner of Highways, and requires the Office to submit a biennial report as described in the bill. The bill decreases the maximum matching allocation that the Board may make to a locality from $10 million to $5 million and provides that no more than $2.5 million of such funds can be used for the maintenance of highway systems. The bill changes the amount of Commonwealth funds allocated to the Board for revenue-sharing from no less than $15 million and no more than $200 million to not in excess of $100 million or seven percent of funds available for distribution by the Board from all funds made available for highway purposes, whichever is greater.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Transportation processes in the Commonwealth; responsibilities of transportation entities, funding.


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB765ER)
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N)
2018-03-06HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (95-Y 2-N)
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-02SenatePassed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N)
2018-03-02SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2018-03-02SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-03-02SenateReading of amendments waived
2018-03-02SenateRead third time
2018-03-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28SenateReported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
2018-02-21SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-21SenateReported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 2-N)
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB765H1
2018-02-12HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18105869D-H1
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-09HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation
2018-02-01HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 18105869D-H1
2018-02-01HouseReported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2018-01-26HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101751D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522223(n/a)See Bill Text
22229(n/a)See Bill Text
332201(n/a)See Bill Text
332214(n/a)See Bill Text
332214.1(n/a)See Bill Text
332223(n/a)See Bill Text
332232(n/a)See Bill Text
332357(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call

Bill Comments