VA HB762 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB762
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Continued to 2025 in Finance by voice vote
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Continued to 2025 in Finance by voice vote
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Organ donation leave tax credit. Establishes a nonrefundable income tax credit for taxable years 2024 through 2028 for a taxpayer that is a private employer, as defined by the bill, for certain costs incurred during a period of organ donation leave received by an employee organ donor.
Title
Organ donation leave tax credit; establishes a nonrefundable credit for taxable years 2024-2028.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | Continued to 2025 in Finance by voice vote |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103542D |
Same As/Similar To
HB762 (Carry Over) 2024-01-31 - Continued to 2025 in Finance by voice vote