VA HB762 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0502)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0502)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Claims; Danial J Williams, Joseph Jesse Dick, Jr., Eric Cameron Wilson, and Derek Elliot Tice. Provides for the relief of Danial J Williams, Joseph Jesse Dick, Jr., Eric Cameron Wilson, and Derek Elliot Tice, also known as the Norfolk Four, who were wrongly convicted of the rape and murder of Michelle Moore Bosko. The relief for each claimant is contingent on the claimant's entering into an agreement requiring the City of Norfolk to compensate him at least the amount of the state relief.
Title
Claims; Danial J. Williams, Joseph Jesse Dick, Jr., Eric Cameron Wilson, and Derek Elliot Tice.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N 2-A) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N 2-A) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0502) | |
2018-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 502 (effective - see bill) | |
2018-03-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB762ER) |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-10 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2018-03-10 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2018-03-10 | House | Conference substitute printed 18108164D-H2 |
2018-03-10 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Surovell, Norment, Carrico |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-02 | House | Delegates: Jones, S.C., Poindexter, Torian |
2018-03-02 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-02 | House | House acceded to request |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N 2-A) |
2018-02-27 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 18107359D-S1 (0-Y 96-N 2-A) |
2018-02-26 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB762S1 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107359D-S1 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107359D-S1 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2018-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 18106685D-EH1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB762EH1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Amendment by Delegate Jones,, S.C. agreed to |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106685D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106685D-H1 |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101001D |