VA HB76 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (14-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (14-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expenditures and reports on instructional spending. Requires each local school board to allocate 65 percent of its operating budget to instructional spending. Local school boards must report annually to the Board of Education the percentage of their operating budgets allocated to instructional spending. Any school division that fails to meet the 65 percent requirement must present a plan to the Board of Education to increase instructional spending by 0.5 percent in the following fiscal year. School divisions failing to submit such a plan must be audited by the Auditor of Public Accounts, who is required to submit a report to the Board with any recommendations he deems appropriate concerning how these school divisions can increase their instructional spending. In addition, the Board must annually report to the Senate Committee on Finance and the House Committee on Appropriations the amount of spending allocated by the local school divisions to instructional spending based on the reports submitted annually by the local school boards. This bill incorporates
Title
Instructional spending; local school board to report expenditures annually.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] | Del. Clifford Athey [R] | Del. Richard Bell [R] | Del. Thomas Greason [R] |
Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. James Massie [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (63-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (63-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Public Education | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-04 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (63-Y 35-N) | |
2010-02-04 | House: Read third time and passed House (63-Y 35-N) | |
2010-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB76H1 | |
2010-02-03 | House: Pending question ordered | |
2010-02-03 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104511D-H1 | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-01 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104511D-H1 | |
2010-02-01 | House: Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 8-N) | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N) | |
2010-01-21 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 3-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Education sub: #3 Teachers and Admin. Action | |
2009-12-29 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2009-12-29 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101470D |
Same As/Similar To
HB96 (Similar To) 2010-01-25 - House: Incorporated by Education (HB76-Bell, Richard P.) by voice vote
HB898 (Similar To) 2010-01-25 - House: Incorporated by Education (HB76-Bell, Richard P.) by voice vote
HB898 (Similar To) 2010-01-25 - House: Incorporated by Education (HB76-Bell, Richard P.) by voice vote