VA HB759 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (8-Y 13-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (8-Y 13-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Certificate of public need; exception. Authorizes the State Health Commissioner to accept, review, and issue a certificate of public need for the establishment of a new ambulatory surgery center located in Planning District 5 for the provision of endoscopic services.
Title
Certificate of public need; establishing ambulatory surgery center in Roanoke Valley-Alleghany RC.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (8-Y 13-N) (Y: 8 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Health, Welfare and Institutions (8-Y 13-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103426D |