VA HB757 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0441)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0441)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Town of Urbanna; liens for water charges. Adds the Town of Urbanna to the list of towns permitted to provide by ordinance that water and sewer charges and taxes incurred shall be a lien on the real estate served by the waterline or sewer.
Title
Town of Urbanna; liens for water charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0441) | |
2012-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 441 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB757ER) | |
2012-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-01 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-30 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-27 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (16-Y 5-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102165D |
Subjects
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Mechanics' and Certain Other Liens
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax
Taxation
Urbanna, Town of
Water and Sewer Systems
Mechanics' and Certain Other Liens
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax
Taxation
Urbanna, Town of
Water and Sewer Systems