VA HB75 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local taxing authority. Restricts localities from imposing a transient occupancy tax at a rate that exceeds five percent and provides that any tax revenues from a rate of greater than two percent but less than five percent shall be spent solely for tourism-related and travel-related purposes. The bill also lowers the amount of food and beverage tax that counties can impose from six percent to a total of four percent. Under the bill, a county is able to impose a food and beverage tax at up to two percent without restriction, but that would require approval via a referendum in order to impose the tax at four percent.
Title
Localities; restricts authority to impose transient occupancy tax at rate that exceeds five percent.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Finance |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101468D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3819 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3833 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3840 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |