VA HB745 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0601)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0601)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Supreme Court of Virginia; judicial caseloads; weighted caseload system. Requires the Supreme Court to develop and implement a weighted caseload system to assess judicial caseloads throughout the Commonwealth, and using that system, requires the Court to determine the need for judicial positions and the optimum distribution of judicial positions throughout the Commonwealth and to prepare a recommended plan for the realignment of the circuit and district boundaries.
Title
Supreme Court of Virginia; required to develop weighted caseload system to assess caseloads, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 3-N) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 3-N) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0601) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 601 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB745ER) | |
2012-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-06 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB745H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104608D-H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-08 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Assigned App. sub: General Government | |
2012-01-30 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-30 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104608D-H1 | |
2012-01-30 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 3-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102754D |
Subjects
Courts Not of Record
Judges, Justices, and Other Elective Officers
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Judges, Justices, and Other Elective Officers
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports