VA HB743 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
Pending: Senate Education: Higher Education Committee
Hearing: Feb 20 @ 8:00 am in Senate Room A, Pocahontas Bldg.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Private student loan providers; certain disclosures. Requires any provider of private student loans to disclose to any student attending an institution of higher education in the Commonwealth, prior to issuing a qualified education loan to such student, the contact information for the Office of the Qualified Education Loan Ombudsman and a summary of the student loan information applicable to private student loans that may be found on the Council's website. The bill provides that any such disclosure may be made in conjunction with or incorporated into another disclosure to such student prior to issuing the qualified education loan. The bill requires the summary to be developed by the Office of the Qualified Education Loan Ombudsman in consultation with relevant stakeholders. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions; qualified education loans, providers of private student loans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14SenateAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-31HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB743H1
2020-01-30HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106390D-H1
2020-01-30HouseRead second time
2020-01-29HouseRead first time
2020-01-27HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106390D-H1
2020-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-13HouseAssigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102544D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231412(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback