VA HB74 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Expungement of misdemeanor drug offenses. Allows a person convicted of a first offense of possession of controlled substances or marijuana who was not afforded the opportunity to be placed on probation in lieu of a conviction to petition to have his conviction expunged after a 10-year period has expired following the conviction.
Title
Drug offenses, misdemeanor; expungement of records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-12-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-12-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100506D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 392.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB74 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB74+hil |