VA HB739 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Repair and maintenance of existing shoreline improvements. Provides that no regulation shall require the replacement of an existing shoreline improvement with a living shoreline if the application is to restore or maintain the existing improvement and that no permitting decision shall require the replacement of an existing shoreline improvement if the living shoreline would substantially detract from established use and enjoyment of the property. The bill also provides that, for purposes of a wetlands permit, a project shall be deemed not suitable for a living shoreline if the proposed work is to maintain or repair an existing shoreline improvement.
Title
Shoreline improvements, existing; repair and maintenance.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104128D |