VA HB738 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0133)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0133)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Presiding officer of county board of supervisors; terminology. Specifies that the presiding officer of a board of supervisors shall be called "chairman," "chairwoman," "chair," "chairperson," or "chair-at-large," in the presiding officer's discretion.
Title
County board of supervisors; presiding officers, terminology.
Sponsors
Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0133) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 133 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 4, 2020 | |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB738ER) |
2020-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (91-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 20100981D-E |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB738E |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (20-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100981D |