VA HB736 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Seaplanes in state parks. Directs the Department of Conservation and Recreation to adopt regulations allowing seaplane pilots to voluntarily land on and take off from lakes located within state parks in accordance with Federal Aviation Administration regulations.
Title
Seaplanes; DCR to allow to land on lakes in state parks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103811D |