VA HB729 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB729

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Transit funding. Raises the existing regional transportation fee, a grantor's tax, from $0.15 per $100 to $0.20 per $100 for localities in the Northern Virginia Transportation Authority that are also members of the Northern Virginia Transportation District. The bill requires half of the revenues to be deposited in the Northern Virginia Transportation Authority Fund and half to be deposited in the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority (WMATA) Capital Fund. The rate of tax in the other localities will remain at $0.15 per $100, with one-third of the revenues to be retained by the locality to be used for transportation purposes and the other two-thirds to be deposited in the Northern Virginia Transportation District Fund. The bill also raises the existing transient occupancy tax in the localities located in the Northern Virginia Transportation District from $2 to $3, with all of the revenues from the tax being used to support WMATA.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transit funding; raises the existing regional transportation fee, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25SenateContinued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute HB729H2
2020-02-10HouseSubstitute by Delegate Watts agreed to 20108032D-H2
2020-02-10HouseCommittee on Finance substitute rejected 20107760D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-10HouseFloor substitute printed 20108032D-H2 (Watts)
2020-02-07HousePassed by for the day
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107760D-H1
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101892D

Same As/Similar To

HB977 (Similar To)
HB729 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3322509(n/a)See Bill Text
5811743(n/a)See Bill Text
581802.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback