VA HB724 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electric cooperatives; net energy metering for agricultural customer-generators; report. Removes the July 1, 2019, sunset provision of the net energy metering program for agricultural customer-generators interconnected with electric cooperatives. The bill provides that, for the purposes of net metering, an agricultural customer-generator may aggregate energy generated on noncontiguous parcels of land if the parcels are (i) owned and operated by the same agricultural customer-generator and (ii) located within a reasonable distance of the customer's original interconnection site. The bill directs the Secretary of Agriculture and Forestry to convene a workgroup for the purpose of assessing policy concerns related to the implementation of small-scale solar energy projects designed to meet the onsite energy needs of agricultural operations in the Commonwealth, and directs the workgroup to report its recommendations to the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake & Natural Resources and the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation & Natural Resources by December 1, 2022.
Title
Electric cooperatives; net energy metering for agricultural customer-generators, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101680D |