VA HB720 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0441)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Property Owners' Association Act; notice on restrictions on display of political signs. Requires the association disclosure packet to contain a statement of any restrictions on the size, place, duration, and manner of placement or display of political signs by a lot owner on his lot.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Owners' Association Act; display of political signs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0441)
2020-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 441 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-06 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-06HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-27HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB720ER)
2020-02-27HouseEnrolled
2020-02-24SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
2020-02-24SenateRead third time
2020-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (81-Y 18-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB720H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107852D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-06HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107852D-H1
2020-02-06HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 4-N)
2020-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101074D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511809(n/a)See Bill Text
5511814(n/a)See Bill Text
5511820.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB720&201+sum+HB720
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB720+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB720H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB720ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0441+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1102V0099+HB0720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0321+HB0720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0857+HB0720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0202+HB0720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0846HB0720+HB0720
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0872HB0720+HB0720

Bill Comments

feedback