VA HB72 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; threat assessment teams; duties; annual meeting with chief law-enforcement officer of locality or a designee from the local law-enforcement agency. Requires the threat assessment team established by the division superintendent for each public elementary or secondary school to meet at least annually on school grounds with the chief law-enforcement officer of the locality or a designee from the local law-enforcement agency to determine potential safety hazards or points of vulnerability on such grounds or in the school building and to discuss and promote active shooter prevention and natural disaster preparedness.
Title
Public schools; threat assessment teams to meet annually with local chief law-enforcement officer.
Sponsors
Del. Chad Green [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Education |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2023-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101225D |