VA HB717 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0973)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0973)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy; electric vehicle rebate working group. Establishes a working group to determine the feasibility of an electric vehicle rebate program. The working group will report on its findings and recommendations by November 1, 2020.
Title
Electric vehicles; DMME to determine feasibility of a rebate program.
Sponsors
Del. David Reid [D] | Sen. Jennifer Carroll Foy [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Del. Martha Mugler [D] | Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0973) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 973 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB717ER) |
2020-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 42-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (55-Y 42-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (29-Y 10-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (12-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB717H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106859D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106859D-H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 7-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103400D |