VA HB716 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-07 - Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-07 - Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Trafficking in persons; penalties. Creates new felonies for trafficking in persons for forced labor or sexual servitude and adds the new felonies as a predicate criminal act under the criminal gang statute, as racketeering crimes, and to the functions of a multijurisdiction grand jury, and also allows seizure and forfeiture of property used in committing such felonies. The new felonies and the existing felony of receiving money for procuring a person are added to the rape shield statute. The bill also makes sexual servitude an affirmative defense to the crime of prostitution and allows a petition for a child in need of services to be substituted for a delinquency petition for certain minors arrested for prostitution, disallows the release of certain victim information, specifies law-enforcement protocol for victims who may not be legally present, requires persons convicted of the new felonies to pay restitution that compensates for the victim's labor, and creates a civil action for trafficked persons. The Secretary of Public Safety is required to convene an anti-trafficking committee and the Virginia Prevention of Human Trafficking Victim Fund is created, which will be administered by the Department of Criminal Justice Services.
Title
Trafficking in persons; penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | House | Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2014-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-30 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102656D |
Subjects
Civil Remedies and Procedure
Courts of Record
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Criminal Procedure
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Courts of Record
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Criminal Procedure
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 346 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 46.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 50.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 11.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 11.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 215.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 305.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.32 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 224.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 42.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 116.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB716 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB716+hil |