VA HB715 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
HOV designation on Interstate 66. Adds to the criteria on which the Commonwealth Transportation Board must base its decision to change the HOV-2 designation to a more restrictive designation on Interstate 66 whether such change in designation has been screened and evaluated by the Department of Transportation in accordance with its responsibilities for analysis of transportation projects in the Northern Virginia Transportation District. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2020.
Title
Interstate 66; requirements that VDOT must satisfy prior to change in HOV-2 designation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715) | |
2016-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 715 (effective 1/1/20) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB715ER) |
2016-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB715H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105405D-H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105405D-H1 |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100367D |