VA HB712 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB712

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Legal notices; online publications. Provides that where any ordinance, resolution, notice, or advertisement is required by law to be published in a newspaper, such ordinance, resolution, notice, or advertisement instead may be published in an online publication, subject to certain requirements specified in the bill. Legal notices; online publications. Provides that where any ordinance, resolution, notice, or advertisement is required by law to be published in a newspaper, such ordinance, resolution, notice, or advertisement instead may be published in an online publication, subject to certain requirements specified in the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legal notices; online publications.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2020-01-27HouseContinued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-01-27HouseIncorporates 4099 (Guzman)
2020-01-27HouseCommittee substitute printed to LIS only 20106681D-H1
2020-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104394D

Same As/Similar To

HB712 (Carry Over) 2020-01-27 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801324(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback