VA HB712 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Interstate 66. Prohibits the imposition or collection of any toll on Interstate 66 from Haymarket to Interstate 495 and requires the same portion of Interstate 66 to include not less than four lanes in each direction.
Title
Interstate 66; tolls prohibited from Haymarket to Interstate 495.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Transportation |
2016-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100730D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB712 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB712+hil |