VA HB710 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local government hiring; people with disabilities. Requires any locality to take into consideration or give preference to an individual's status as a person with a disability in its employment hiring policies and practices, provided that such person with a disability meets all of the knowledge, skills, and eligibility requirements for the available position.
Title
Local government; hiring people with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 306 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB710ER) |
2022-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102125D |