VA HB71 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0421)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Constitutional amendment (voter referendum); real property tax exemption for surviving spouses of certain disabled veterans. Provides for a referendum at the November 6, 2018, election to approve or reject an amendment to the real property tax exemption for a primary residence that is currently provided to the surviving spouses of veterans who had a one hundred percent service-connected, permanent, and total disability to allow the surviving spouse to move to a different principal place of residence. Similar real property tax exemptions provided in the Constitution of Virginia to (i) the surviving spouses of members of the armed forces killed in action and (ii) the surviving spouses of certain emergency services providers killed in the line of duty allow the surviving spouse to move to a different principal place of residence and still claim the tax exemption. This bill is the companion ballot legislation for HJR 6 and is identical to SB 900.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; real property tax exemption for spouse of disabled veteran.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0421)
2018-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 421 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-14HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
2018-03-08SenateSigned by President
2018-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB71ER)
2018-03-05HouseEnrolled
2018-03-01SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-01SenateRead third time
2018-02-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27SenateReported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-20SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-07HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-05HouseRead first time
2018-02-02HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2018-01-22HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #4
2017-12-04HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2017-12-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100171D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB71
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB71+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB71ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0421+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1804V0007+HB0071
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H18V0018+HB0071
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0394+HB0071
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S08V0101+HB0071
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0298+HB0071
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0749HB0071+HB0071
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0804HB0071+HB0071

Bill Comments

feedback