VA HB707 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation funding; statewide prioritization process; resiliency. Adds resiliency, defined in the bill, to the list of factors to be considered during the statewide transportation funding prioritization process commonly known as SMART SCALE. The bill also requires that the factors of congestion mitigation, economic development, accessibility, safety, resiliency, and environmental quality be considered relative to the anticipated life-cycle cost of the project or strategy under consideration.
Title
Transportation funding; statewide prioritization process, resiliency.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by with letter (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by with letter (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Transportation |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102145D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 2 | 1503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 214.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 370 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 371 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |