VA HB707 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - House: Continued to 2013 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - House: Continued to 2013 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Funeral protests; penalty. Makes it unlawful for a person to disrupt a funeral or memorial service during the 60 minutes immediately preceding through the time immediately following such service with the intent to disrupt the service. A violation of this provision is a Class 2 misdemeanor for the first offense and a Class 1 misdemeanor for a subsequent offense.
Title
Funeral protests; penalty.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] | Del. Joe May [R] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Del. Thomas Rust [R] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] | Del. David Toscano [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | House: Continued to 2013 in Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2012-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote | |
2012-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103838D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB707 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB707+hil |