VA HB705 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB705
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
State air, waste, and water boards; permit authority; appointment of members. Removes the authority to issue, reissue, amend, or modify permits or certificates or to hear permit actions from the State Air Pollution Control Board, the Waste Management Board, and the State Water Control Board and places such authority with the Department of Environmental Quality. The bill changes the composition of the three boards from appointment exclusively by the Governor to the following: two members appointed by the Governor; two members appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules from a list recommended by the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources; and three members appointed by the Speaker of the House from a list recommended by the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources. The appointing authority shall appoint members for the unexpired term upon a vacancy other than by expiration of a term. State air, waste, and water boards; permit authority; appointment of members. Removes the authority to issue, reissue, amend, or modify permits or certificates or to hear permit actions from the State Air Pollution Control Board, the Waste Management Board, and the State Water Control Board and places such authority with the Department of Environmental Quality. The bill changes the composition of the three boards from appointment exclusively by the Governor to the following: two members appointed by the Governor; two members appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules from a list recommended by the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources; and three members appointed by the Speaker of the House from a list recommended by the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources. The appointing authority shall appoint members for the unexpired term upon a vacancy other than by expiration of a term.
Title
State air, waste, and water boards; permit authority, appointment of members.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-05 | House | Continued to 2021 with substitute in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed to LIS only 20107564D-H1 |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103260D |
Same As/Similar To
HB705 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 with substitute in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1186.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1307.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1308.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1322.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1322.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1402.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1408.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2403.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 5101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 1205.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 254 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 242 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 255 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |