VA HB7001 | 2021 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Budget Bill. Amends Chapter 1289 of the Acts of Assembly of 2020, as amended by Chapter 56 of the Acts of Assembly of 2020, Special Session 1, and Chapter 552 of the Acts of Assembly of 2021, Special Session 1. House Budget Floor Amendments: Budget Bill. Amends Chapter 1289 of the Acts of Assembly of 2020, as amended by Chapter 56 of the Acts of Assembly of 2020, Special Session 1, and Chapter 552 of the Acts of Assembly of 2021, Special Session 1. House Budget Floor Amendments:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Budget Bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (78-Y 20-N) (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 87-N) (Y: 0 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2021-08-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (71-Y 25-N) (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - House - House: VOTE: Pass By (54-Y 43-N) (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - House - House: VOTE: Pass By (53-Y 43-N) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - House - House: VOTE: Pass By (54-Y 43-N) (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-10 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
2021-08-10 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1 (effective 8/10/21)
2021-08-10 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., August 16, 2021
2021-08-10HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on August 10, 2021
2021-08-10SenateSigned by President
2021-08-09HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-08-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB7001ER)
2021-08-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB7001ER)
2021-08-09HouseEnrolled
2021-08-09SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 16-N)
2021-08-09HouseVOTE: Adoption (78-Y 20-N)
2021-08-09HouseConference report agreed to by House (78-Y 20-N)
2021-08-06 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2021-08-05SenateSenators: Howell, Barker, Saslaw, Locke, Lucas, Deeds, Hanger
2021-08-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2021-08-05HouseDelegates: Torian, Sickles, Carr, Tyler, Bulova, Knight, Austin
2021-08-05HouseConferees appointed by House
2021-08-05HouseHouse acceded to request
2021-08-05SenateSenate requested conference committee
2021-08-05SenateSenate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N)
2021-08-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (0-Y 87-N)
2021-08-05HouseSenate substitute rejected by House (0-Y 87-N)
2021-08-05SenatePassed Senate with substitute (25-Y 14-N)
2021-08-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB7001S1
2021-08-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21300382D-S1
2021-08-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-08-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-08-05SenateRead second time
2021-08-04SenateCommittee substitute printed 21300382D-S1
2021-08-04SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 1-N)
2021-08-04SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2021-08-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-08-04HouseVOTE: Passage (71-Y 25-N)
2021-08-04HouseRead third time and passed House (71-Y 25-N)
2021-08-03HouseEngrossed by House
2021-08-03HouseVOTE: Pass By (54-Y 43-N)
2021-08-03HouseMotion to pass by Del. Miyares floor amendment agreed to (54-Y 43-N)
2021-08-03HouseVOTE: Pass By (53-Y 43-N)
2021-08-03HouseMotion to pass by Del. Davis floor amendments agreed to (54-Y 43-N)
2021-08-03HouseVOTE: Pass By (54-Y 43-N)
2021-08-03HouseMotion to pass by floor substitute agreed to (53-Y 43-N)
2021-08-03HouseRead second time
2021-08-03HouseFloor substitute printed 21300314D-H1 (Gilbert)
2021-08-02HouseRead first time
2021-08-02HouseReported from Appropriations (19-Y 2-N)
2021-07-30HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-07-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/02/21 21300144D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+sum+HB7001
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+ful+HB7001+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+ful+HB7001H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+ful+HB7001S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+ful+HB7001ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+ful+CHAP0001+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+amd+HB7001AHR
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+amd+HB7001AC
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+vot+H02V0001+HB7001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+vot+HV0009+HB7001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+vot+HV0010+HB7001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+vot+HV0008+HB7001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+vot+S05V0002+HB7001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+vot+HV0013+HB7001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+vot+SV0049HB7001+HB7001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+vot+SV0050HB7001+HB7001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+vot+SV0052HB7001+HB7001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+vot+HV0014+HB7001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+vot+SV0059HB7001+HB7001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?213+vot+HV0016+HB7001

Bill Comments 750

feedback