VA HB693 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Continued to 2017 in Finance by voice vote
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Continued to 2017 in Finance by voice vote
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Standard deduction; adjusted for inflation. Adjusts the individual income tax standard deduction annually beginning with the 2017 taxable year by the percentage increase in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers (CPI-U), for all items, from July 1 through June 30 for the year immediately preceding the taxable year.
Title
Income tax, state; adjusts standard deduction for inflation.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | House | Continued to 2017 in Finance by voice vote |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote |
2016-02-02 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102065D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB693 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB693+hil |