VA HB692 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Parking violations. Adds Prince William County to existing provisions that grant certain localities authority to provide by ordinance that whenever any motor vehicle against which there are three or more outstanding unpaid or otherwise unsettled parking violation notices is found parked upon private property, the vehicle may be removed or immobilized. The county previously had the authority granted under this provision but was inadvertently omitted from the rewrite of this section in 2007 by a bill that sought to replace locality descriptions with locality names. This bill incorporates
Title
Removal of motor vehicles; adds Prince William Co. to localities that may remove or immobilize.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023) | |
2010-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 23 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-02-19 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-02-18 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-02-18 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB692ER) | |
2010-02-18 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-01-26 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB692H1 | |
2010-01-25 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104408D-H1 | |
2010-01-25 | House: Read second time | |
2010-01-22 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-21 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104408D-H1 | |
2010-01-21 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-18 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102149D |
Same As/Similar To
HB298 (Similar To) 2010-01-21 - House: Incorporated by Transportation (HB692-Miller, J.H.) by voice vote
HB492 (Similar To) 2010-01-21 - House: Incorporated by Transportation (HB692-Miller, J.H.) by voice vote
HB492 (Similar To) 2010-01-21 - House: Incorporated by Transportation (HB692-Miller, J.H.) by voice vote