VA HB690 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Assisted living facilities; involuntary discharge of a resident. Provides that an assisted living facility shall not involuntary discharge a patient except (i) in cases in which the resident's condition presents an immediate and serious risk to the health, safety, or welfare of the resident or others and emergency discharge is necessary to protect the health, safety, or welfare of the resident or others; (ii) for nonpayment of contracted charges; or (iii) for failure of the resident to substantially comply with the terms and conditions of the lease agreement between the resident and the assisted living facility. The bill requires an assisted living facility to take steps to prevent the involuntary discharge, requires an assisted living facility to provide at least 30 days' notice of the involuntary discharge, and requires the assisted living facility to provide a discharge plan for the resident prior to involuntary discharge. The bill also requires the Department of Social Services to establish a process by which a resident or the resident's representative may appeal the decision of the assisted living facility to involuntarily discharge a resident to the Department and requires the Department to conduct a review to determine whether the assisted living facility has complied with the requirements of the bill.
Title
Assisted living facilities; involuntary discharge of a resident.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105269D-H1 |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103628D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 1805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1805.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |