VA HB688 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0363)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0363)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Community health workers; certification. Establishes requirements for use of the title "certified community health worker."
Title
Certified community health workers; establishes requirements for use of the title.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0363) | |
2020-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 363 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB688ER) |
2020-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB688H1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20105689D-H1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-28 | House | Incorporates HB474 (Guzman) |
2020-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 20105689D-H1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101287D |
Same As/Similar To
HB474 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions