VA HB686 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0439)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0439)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unclaimed property; deposits with financial institutions; charges and interest. Clarifies the criteria that must be met for a bank or other financial organization to impose charges or cease to pay interest on a dormant or inactive account that differ from those imposed on active accounts. The holder may reverse or cancel dormancy charges or retroactively credit interest upon the request of the owner if it also does so for all such property that becomes subject to certain statutory reporting requirements regarding unclaimed property. If the holder elects not to reverse or cancel dormancy charges or retroactively credit interest with respect to any such property, then it is not required to reverse or cancel dormancy charges or retroactively credit interest for property that becomes subject to the reporting requirements regarding unclaimed property. A holder may also reverse or cancel dormancy charges or retroactively credit interest with respect to any or all such property to correct a documented internal error without becoming required to reverse or cancel dormancy charges or retroactively credit interest for all such property that becomes subject to unclaimed property reporting requirements. An enactment states that the measure is declarative of existing law. This bill is identical to SB 253.
Title
Unclaimed property; deposits and funds with financial institutions, charges and interest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0439) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 439 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB686ER) |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107136D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB686S1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107136D-S1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107136D-S1 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB686H1 |
2018-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105321D-H1 |
2018-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105321D-H1 |
2018-01-29 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102283D |