VA HB684 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Online case information system; juvenile and domestic relations district court. Requires the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court to make certain nonconfidential information for adult criminal cases in the juvenile and domestic relations district courts publicly viewable in the online case information system. Under current law, only criminal cases in circuit courts participating in the Executive Secretary's case management system and in the general district courts are required to be made publicly available in such system.
Title
Online case information system; juvenile and domestic relations district court.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2020-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102738D |